skip to content

Gandara, Esteban

CPSO#: 90801

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 15 Oct 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 15 Oct 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Universidad Maimonides, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 29 Jul 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 30 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Jul 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Oct 2016