skip to content

Ganapathy, Venkatanarayanan

CPSO#: 97514

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Jul 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 16 May 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Tamil Nadu Dr M G R Medical University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 23 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jul 2013
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2013 to 31 Jan 2014
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 May 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Jul 2014