skip to content

Ganapathy, Anusoumya

CPSO#: 93949

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Jul 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Tamil

Education:Tamil Nadu Dr M G R Medical University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone: (519) 837-6440 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

William Osler Health System
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Canada
Phone: (905) 494-2120
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Anusoumya Ganapathy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 12 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ganapathy ( CPSO# 93949 )

Business Address:
Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1J 4E4
Phone Number: (519) 822-5350

Business Address:
William Osler Health System
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:01 Jul 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective:01 Jul 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Critical Care Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Critical Care Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2018 to 30 Dec 2018
CF - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 28 May 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 28 May 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 28 May 2014 Active
 Dr.  Anusoumya  Ganapathy  may  practise  medicine  independently  in  internal
            medicine and critical care medicine, only.