skip to content

Gan, Kenman Dang

CPSO#: 97222

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 31 Jul 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 31 Jul 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2211 Carling Avenue
Ottawa BC  K2B 7E9
Phone: 6132267061

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Alberta

British Columbia

Manitoba

Saskatchewan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KENMAN DANG GAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jan 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2018