skip to content

Gammon, Jessica

CPSO#: 84714

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Sep 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Sep 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5-737 Silver Seven Rd
Kanata ON  K2V 0H3
Phone: 613-828-3122
Fax: 613-672-2010 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

304-2249 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON  K2B 7E9
Canada
Phone: 613-702-1688
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Medical Records Location

Address: Capital KidZ Medical Centre, 5-737 Silver Seven Road, Kanata ON K2V 0H3
Date Received: 15 Oct 2020

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JESSICA GAMMON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAMMON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Oct 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2021