skip to content

Gamble, James Brian

CPSO#: 21480

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 05 Jul 1968

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Brian Gamble Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 6 2015

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical records may contact Ms. Cheryl Crow at (519) 354-5540.
Date Received: 26 Jul 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1977 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2015