skip to content

Gambhir, Puneeta

CPSO#: 96885

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 22 Nov 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Nov 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Karnatak University Dharwar, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
115 - 4515 Ebenezer road
Brampton ON  L6P 2K7
Phone: (905) 794-9685
Fax: (905) 794-2826 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr Puneeta Gambhir Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Gambhir ( CPSO# 96885 )

Business Address:
Unit 115
4515 Ebenezer Road
Brampton ON  L6P 2K7
Phone Number: (905) 794-9685

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:25 Nov 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PUNEETA GAMBHIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAMBHIR is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Oct 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Oct 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 05 Oct 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Nov 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Nov 2012