skip to content

Gallo, Antonio Giovanni

CPSO#: 100649

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 02 Aug 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 Aug 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Joseph and Wolf Lebovic
Health Complex L2 409 Box 22
60 Murray St
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 2799
Fax: 647-837-5819 Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 27 Jul 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANTONIO GIOVANNI GALLO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GALLO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 23 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 24 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 23 Aug 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 24 Aug 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 23 Aug 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 24 Aug 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 27 Jul 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Jul 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2018