skip to content

Gallinger, Zane Ryan

CPSO#: 98186

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
445 - 600 University Avenue
Toronto ON
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586 4800 Ext. 6156
Fax: 416-586-5927 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

340 College Street
Suite 601
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective:03 Oct 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ZANE RYAN GALLINGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GALLINGER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Sep 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016