skip to content

Gallego, Patricia Herold

CPSO#: 94828

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 10 Feb 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 10 Feb 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:Universidade Federal Do Parana, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC Children's Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8138
Fax: (519) 685-8105 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Patricia Gallego Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 20 2021

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Gallego ( CPSO# 94828 )

Business Address:
6 Ravine Ridge Way
London ON  N5X 3R3

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:01 Jul 2018 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Feb 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 22 Oct 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Feb 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Jan 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2018 Active
             1.    Dr. Patricia Herold Gallego may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Paediatrics,  Division  of   Endocrinology,  University  of Western
                        Ontario, in which Dr. Gallego holds an academic appointment  at the
                        rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Gallego no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.