skip to content

Gallagher, Erin Elisabeth

CPSO#: 97916

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 Feb 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Stonechurch Family Health Centre
1475 Upper Ottawa Street
Hamilton, Ontario
L8W 3J6
Hamilton ON  L8P 1H6
Phone: (905)574-1444
Fax: (905)575-9892 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Erin Gallagher Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 31 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Gallagher ( CPSO# 97916 )

Business Address:
McMaster Family Practice
David Braley Health Sciences Centre
Department of Family Medicine
100 Main Street West, 3rd Floor
Hamilton ON  L8S 1H6

Business Address:
Stonechurch Family Health Centre
1475 Upper Ottawa
Hamilton ON  L8W 3J6
Phone Number: (905) 575-1300

Business Address:
Juravinski Hospital
Palliative Care On-Call Service
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 389-4411

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jan 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ERIN ELISABETH GALLAGHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GALLAGHER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 09 Feb 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 10 Feb 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 08 Feb 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Palliative Care Medicine

McMaster University, 09 Feb 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Palliative Care Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 25 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Palliative Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2016