skip to content

Gall, Robert Christopher McLellan

CPSO#: 98008

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
567 Cundles Road East
2nd Floor
Barrie ON  L4M 0J7
Phone: (705) 726-4681
Fax: (705) 739-8404 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: R. Gall Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 20 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Gall ( CPSO# 98008 )

Business Address:
2nd Floor
567 Cundles Road East
Barrie ON  L4M 0J7
Phone Number: (705) 726-4681

Business Address:
2223 Ladyslipper Cres
London ON  N6K 0A5

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ROBERT CHRISTOPHER MCLELLAN GALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GALL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2014