skip to content

Gall, James Murray

CPSO#: 26677

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 02 Jan 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 03 Feb 1981

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Jim Gall Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 14 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1975 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Sep 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jan 2020