skip to content

Gale, Jenna

CPSO#: 95976

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 03 May 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Fertility Centre
955 Green Valley Crescent #100
Ottawa ON  K2C3V4
Phone: 6136863378 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Jenna Gale Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 10 2021

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Gale ( CPSO# 95976 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:03 Apr 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JENNA GALE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GALE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 14 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 15 Dec 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 03 Apr 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 04 Apr 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 18 Dec 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility

University of Ottawa, 19 Dec 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 May 2017