skip to content

Galbraith, Elizabeth Catherine

CPSO#: 26462

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of St. Andrews, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Requests for records should be directed to Dr. M. Imbulgoda's office at 905-689-8242
Date Received: 11 Feb 2014

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1969
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 May 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013