Gaisano, Gregory Gan (CPSO#: 100966)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-2200
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Herbert Y. Gaisano Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 19 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Gan-Gaisano ( CPSO# 63318 )
Dr. G. Gaisano ( CPSO# 100966)
Dr. H. Gaisano ( CPSO# 63315 )

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Suite 8MP-327
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5949


Corporation Name: Gregory G. Gaisano Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 18 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Gaisano ( CPSO# 100966)

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-2200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GREGORY GAN GAISANO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAISANO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2017