skip to content

Gainey, Richard Joseph

CPSO#: 30790

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 17 Jul 2001
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 19 Apr 1985

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:National University of Ireland, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:17 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective:06 Dec 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Jul 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Apr 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Jul 2001