skip to content

Gagnon, Louise-Helene

CPSO#: 91328

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 09 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue, Suite B725
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-5845
Fax: (416) 754-0244 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. L.H. Gagnon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 26 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Gagnon ( CPSO# 91328 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room B725
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-5845

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LOUISE-HELENE GAGNON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAGNON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 2016