skip to content

Gagnier, Rachel Melissa

CPSO#: 94244

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 29 Jun 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. R. M. Gagnier Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 19 2018

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:19 Oct 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RACHEL MELISSA GAGNIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAGNIER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2010 to 14 Aug 2010
EL - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2011