skip to content

Gagarin, Ruben

CPSO#: 92276

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Aug 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Aug 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:Baskirian State Medical University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough Health Network
Centenary Site
Shoniker Clinic
2877A Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4C1
Phone: (416) 281-7301
Fax: (416) 281-7465 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Ruben Gagarin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 19 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Gagarin ( CPSO# 92276 )

Business Address:
Rouge Valley Health System
Centenary Site
Shoniker Clinic
2877A Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4C1
Phone Number: (416) 281-7301

Business Address:
1520 Steeles Avenue West
Suite 101A
Vaughan ON  L4K 3B9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Health Network, Centenary Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:03 May 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RUBEN GAGARIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAGARIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Nov 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 19 Nov 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2011