skip to content

Gadbois, Kristen Julie

CPSO#: 96921

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 26 Sep 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Sep 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Anesthesiology
Critical Care Wing 1401
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8187 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Kristen Gadbois Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 02 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Gadbois ( CPSO# 96921 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital-General Campus
Department of Anesthesiology
Critical Care Wing 1401
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8187

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 15 Dec 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KRISTEN JULIE GADBOIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GADBOIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 24 Oct 2011 to 20 Nov 2011
Elective Trainee - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 25 Sep 2012 to 21 Oct 2012
Elective Trainee - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 30 Jul 2013 to 26 Aug 2013
Elective Trainee - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Nov 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Oct 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Aug 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2014