skip to content

Gabril, Manal Youssef

CPSO#: 86020

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 14 Mar 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 14 Mar 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Minya, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC University Campus Site
Department of Pathology
P O Box 5339
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Manal Gabril Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 12 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Gabril ( CPSO# 86020 )

Business Address:
LHSC University Campus Site
Department of Pathology
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective:30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MANAL YOUSSEF GABRIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GABRIL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Apr 2007 to 01 Jun 2007
CF - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 2007