skip to content

Gabrielli, Lisa Marie

CPSO#: 100678

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Niagara Health System
Welland Hospital Site
65 Third Street
Welland ON  L3B 4W6
Phone: 905-378-4647 Ext. 33016
Fax: 905-788-0046 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Gabrielli Rust Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 22 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rust ( CPSO# 100814)
Dr. L. Gabrielli ( CPSO# 100678)

Business Address:
Niagara Health System
Welland Hospital Site
65 Third Street
Welland ON  L3B 4W6
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Business Address:
230 Bertie Street
Fort Erie ON  L2A 1Z2
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Business Address:
260 Sugarloaf Street
Port Colborne ON  L3K 2N7
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Business Address:
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6X2
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Business Address:
176 Wellington Street
Niagara-on-the-lake ON  L0S 1J0

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Port Colborne General Site Port Colborne
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LISA MARIE GABRIELLI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GABRIELLI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2015