skip to content

Gabrielle, Denis Michael Stephen

CPSO#: 27379

MEMBER STATUS
Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 14 Jul 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Dec 1995

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Toronto, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Dec 1995
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 01 Dec 1995
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 25 Feb 1998
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 14 Jul 2000

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 14 Jul 2000
Summary:

On July 14, 2000, the Discipline Committee of the College found Dr. Gabrielle guilty of professional misconduct in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and engaged in conduct that would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. In addition, the committee found him incompetent. Subsequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Gabrielle be reprimanded and the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the register. The Committee ordered his Certificate of Registration be revoked immediately.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jul 11, 2000

 

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 25 Feb 1998
Summary:

On February 24-25, 1998, the Discipline Committee heard an application to vary the conditions imposed on Dr. Gabrielle's certificate of registration in November 1995. The Committee directs the Registrar to remove the existing terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Gabrielle's Certificate of Registration and to impose the following terms, conditions and limitations:

1. Dr. Gabrielle shall be permitted to practise family medicine only and only at the clinic operated by Dr. Batu Malek.

2. Dr. Gabrielle shall practise under the supervision of Dr. Batu Malek.

3. Dr. Malek shall be in the clinic at all times that Dr. Gabrielle is seeing patients.

4. Dr. Gabrielle shall meet with Dr. Malek for a minimum of 1 1/2 hours twice a month to discuss clinical problems and to review charts of patients seen by Dr. Gabrielle.

5. Dr. Gabrielle shall not perform routine intimate examinations.

6. Dr. Gabrielle may perform intimate examinations only at the request of a nurse who shall be present during the examination.

7. Dr. Gabrielle shall not prescribe narcotics.

8. Dr. Gabrielle shall work no more than 32 hours per week.

9. Dr. Malek shall provide written quarterly reports in a form satisfactory to the Registrar regarding Dr. Gabrielle s progress and adherence to the foregoing conditions.

10. Dr. Gabrielle shall continue therapy with Dr. R.W. Hill on a weekly basis for the first six months, and then as determined by Dr. Hill.

11. Mrs. Cheryl Gabrielle shall communicate once a month with Dr. Hill regarding Dr.
Gabrielle s overall physical and mental health and lifestyle.

12. Dr. Malek shall communicate at least quarterly with Dr. Hill to discuss Dr. Gabrielle's progress.

13. Dr. Hill shall provide written quarterly reports in a form satisfactory to the Registrar concerning Dr. Gabrielle's attendance and progress in therapy.

14. Dr. Gabrielle shall place himself in the ongoing care of a family physician (other than Dr. Malek or any other physician working in Dr. Malek s office) who shall monitor his overall health and report periodically to Dr. Hill on the state of Dr. Gabrielle's health.

15. Dr. Gabrielle shall take the next available CPSO Prescribing Skills Course (May 13-15, 1998) at his own expense.

16. Dr. Gabrielle shall attend the CPSO Record-Keeping course within the six months of starting clinical practice at his own expense.

17. Dr. Gabrielle may apply to the College in no less than two years from now for review of these conditions.

Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 24 Feb 1998

 

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 27 Mar 1995
Summary:

In March 1995, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Gabrielle guilty of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 27(29) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, and in s. 29(30) of Ontario Regulation 548/90, as amended, in that he committed sexual impropriety with a patient. The Committee further found Dr. Gabrielle guilty of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 51(1)(b. 1) of the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, as amended, in that he had sexually abused a patient. The Committee further found him incompetent, as defined in s. 61(4) ofthe Health Disciplines Act, 1990, as amended, in that he displayed in his professional care of a patient a lack of knowledge, skill or judgment or disregard for the welfare of the patient of a nature or to an extent that demonstrates he is unfit to continue in practice. The Committee further found Dr. Gabrielle incompetent, as defined in s. 52(1) of the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, as amended, in that his professional care of a patient displayed a lack of knowledge, skill or judgment or disregard for the welfare of the patient of a nature or to an extent that demonstrates that heis unfit to continue to practice or that his practice should be restricted. Consequently, the Committee imposed the following penalty:

1. Dr. Gabrielle was to be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register.

2. Dr. Gabrielle s licence to practice was to be suspended for a period of eighteen months.

3. At the conclusion of this period of suspension, Dr. Gabrielle s licence was to be restricted for an indefinite period of
time, such that he be restricted to assisting at surgery at the hospital at which he had privileges.

4. Any removal of the restriction on Dr. Gabrielle s licence imposed under paragraph 3 cited above was to be done by application to the Discipline Committee, and, to be successful, would have to satisfy the following criteria:
 
(a) At least one year was to have elapsed since the date on which this Order became final;

(b) Dr. Gabrielle must have demonstrated that he understood the nature and significance of his unacceptable conduct;

(c) Dr. Gabrielle must have participated in a program of ongoing, twice-monthly psychiatric treatments at his own expense, commencing at the conclusion of his period of suspension;

(d) A thorough psychiatric evaluation must show that Dr. Gabrielle's return to a less restricted practice was compatible with public safety; this evaluation was to be done at the Doctor's own expense by a psychiatrist acceptable to the Registrar who had full knowledge of the findings made by the Discipline Committee; and

(e) Dr. Gabrielle must have demonstrated that his medical knowledge and skills had been maintained;

5. In the event of Dr. Gabrielle successfully obtaining the removal of the restrictions cited above in paragraph 3, his licence to practice was thereafter to be restricted indefinitely such that, should he practice in an office or clinical setting, his practice there was to be supervised by another member of the College who was to submit regular quarterly reports to the Registrar, which were to be satisfactory to the Registrar, confirming that supervision had been carried out and that Dr. Gabrielle was perfoming his professional responsibilities in a competent and ethical fashion;

6. Any removal of the restriction on Dr. Gabrielle s licence to practice imposed under paragraph 5 cited above was to be done by application to a panel of the Discipline Committee. For such application to be successful, Dr. Gabrielle would need to satisfy the following criteria:

(a) A period of two years must have elapsed since the removal of the restrictions imposed under paragraph 3 cited above;

(b) Dr. Gabrielle must have demonstrated that, during the period when the restriction imposed under paragraph 5 cited above was in place, he had carried out his professional responsibilities in a competent and ethical fashion; and

(c) A further psychiatric evaluation of Dr. Gabrielle was to have indicated that his return to unrestricted and unsupervised practice was compatible with public safety. This evaluation was to be done at Dr. Gabrielle's own expense by a psychiatrist acceptable to the Registrar, who had full knowledge of the Discipline Committee's findings.
 
 


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Abandoned
Appeal Decision Date: 1996-01-09
Hearing Date(s): Aug 02, 1994