skip to content

Gabrail, Yousry Abdel-Karim Tawfik

CPSO#: 88614

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Cairo, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
540 - 2525 Old Bronte Rd
Oakville ON  L6M 4J2
Phone: (905) 827-9865
Fax: (905) 827-3583 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

Huron Square Medical Centre
2500 Hurontario Street
Mississauga ON  L5B 1N4
Canada
Phone: (905) 897-6160
Fax: (905) 897-6729
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Yousry Gabrail Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 13 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Gabrail ( CPSO# 88614 )

Business Address:
2525 Old Bronte Road
Suite 540
Oakville ON  L6M 4J2
Phone Number: (905) 827-9865

Business Address:
Huron Square Medical Centre
2500 Hurontario Street
Mississauga ON  L5B 1N4
Phone Number: (905) 879-6160

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:24 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. YOUSRY ABDEL-KARIM TAWFIK GABRAIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GABRAIL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
AVP - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010