skip to content

Gabel, Kevin David

CPSO#: 84751

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
Branson Division
555 Finch Avenue West, 5th floor
Toronto ON  M2R 1N5
Phone: (416) 632 8703
Fax: (416) 632-8704 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Kevin Gabel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 26 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Gabel ( CPSO# 84751 )

Business Address:
Branson Hospital
Suite 542
555 Finch Avenue West
North York ON  M2R 1N5
Phone Number: (416) 632-8746

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry Effective: 26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KEVIN DAVID GABEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GABEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011