skip to content

Gabay, Jose Israel

CPSO#: 21016

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 09 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 09 Jul 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian, Portuguese, Spanish

Education:University of Madrid, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: For copy of records please contact Dr. Gabay at 905-270-2713
Date Received: 17 Jan 2014

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1965
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1967
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 1967
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Jul 2012