skip to content

Gaal, Judit Margit

CPSO#: 30039

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hungarian

Education:University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Judit M. Gaal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 6 2019

Medical Records Location

Address: RSRS Inc. 111 St. Regis Cr. S North York ON M3J 1Y6 Phone: 1-888-563-3732
Date Received: 24 Apr 2019


Address: 404 - 220 Dundas St W Whitby, ON L1N 8M7 Tel: 905-668-5300
Instructions: Patients may contact above.
Date Received: 22 Mar 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019