skip to content

Sudhakaran Nair, Gopakumar

CPSO#: 85923

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Sep 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Sep 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Malayalam

Education:University of Kerala, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hosptial Of Eastern Onta
Department of Anesthesiology & Pain
401 Symth Road
Ottawa ON  K1G 6W4
Phone: 613-737-2431
Fax: 613-738-4815 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Parlow Saha Wang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 2 2019
Corporation Name: G. Sudhakaran Nair Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 03 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Sudhakaran Nair ( CPSO# 85923 )
Dr. A. Pillai ( CPSO# 108879)

Business Address:
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-2431


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



India

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:03 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GOPAKUMAR SUDHAKARAN NAIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUDHAKARAN NAIR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2007 to 16 Mar 2007
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 17 Mar 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Jul 2009
CF - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Mar 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2014