skip to content

Rubio Gomez, Gustavo Adolfo

CPSO#: 95554

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Colegio Mayor De Ntra Sra Del Rosario, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 8
33 Farley Drive
Guelph ON  N1L 0B7
Phone: (519) 836 8558
Fax: (519) 822 0403 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Gustavo Rubio Gomez Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 04 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Rubio Gomez ( CPSO# 95554 )
Dr. C. Posso De Los Rios ( CPSO# 96168 )

Business Address:
8 - 33 Farley Drive
Guelph ON  N1L 0B7
Phone Number: (519) 836-8558

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Dermatology
M1 - 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4908


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Colombia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GUSTAVO ADOLFO RUBIO GOMEZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUBIO GOMEZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 20 Sep 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 21 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Sep 2014
Assessment Verification Period - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 27 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 28 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018