skip to content

Rowland, Gerald Clark

CPSO#: 30936

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of 18 Aug 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 18 Aug 2019
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Date of Death: 18-Aug-2019

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: G.C. Rowland Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 26 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Rowland ( CPSO# 30936 )

Business Address:
Tillsonburg Medical Clinic
154 Rolph Street
Tillsonburg ON  N4G 3Z1
Phone Number: (519) 842-3682

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1979
Expired: Member deceased. Expiry date: 18 Aug 2019

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: January 27, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:

Update: As of August 2, 2018, Dr. Gerald Rowland has completed all elements of his SCERP.
Download Full Document (PDF)