skip to content

Krishna, Gajan Ethan

CPSO#: 96252

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Apr 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Apr 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:Ross University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
6212 Main Street, Suite 202
Stouffville ON  L4A 2S5
Phone: (905) 591-4969
Fax: (877) 595-1865 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

381 Church St
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Canada
Phone: (905) 472-7000
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

640 Grace St
Newmarket ON  L3Y8V7
Canada
Phone: 9058957661
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

The Mississauga Hospital
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Gajan E. Krishna Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 13 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Krishna ( CPSO# 96252 )

Business Address:
100 The Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Business Address:
202 - 6212 Main Street
Stouffville ON  L4A 2S5
Phone Number: (905) 591-4969

Business Address:
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P9


Corporation Name: Gajan Ethan Krishna Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 08 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Krishna ( CPSO# 96252 )

Business Address:
Suite 202
6212 Main Street
Stouffville ON  L4A 2S5
Phone Number: (416) 419-6980

Business Address:
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Business Address:
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Dec 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GAJAN ETHAN KRISHNA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRISHNA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Apr 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Apr 2014