skip to content

Khan, Ghulam Zain-Ul-Din

CPSO#: 83623

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 18 Jun 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 14 Sep 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:Quaid-i-Azam University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 1B
6884 14th Ave
Markham ON  L6B 1A8
Phone: (905) 201-7773
Fax: (905) 201-4835 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: G. Khan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 26 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Khan ( CPSO# 83623 )

Business Address:
Suite 1B
6884 14th Avenue
Markham ON  L6B 1A8
Phone Number: (905) 201-7773

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 15 Aug 2005 to 13 Oct 2005
AVP - Psychiatry

Western University, 14 Oct 2005 to 14 Aug 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Oct 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Aug 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2010
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 14 Sep 2017
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 13 Apr 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 13 Apr 2020 Active
             As from April 13, 2020, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and
            limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Ghulam Zain-Ul-Din
            Khan in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Khan to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                              DR. GHULAM ZAIN-UI-DIN KHAN
                                          ("Dr. Khan")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                  COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Khan, certificate of registration number 83623, am a member of the
                  College.

            (3)   I, Dr. Khan, acknowledge that following an investigation that raised
                  concerns about my standard of practice, I underwent remediation and
                  submitted to a reassessment of my practice. The reassessment report
                  subsequently received by the College raised concerns about my standard of
                  practice.

            (4)   I, Dr. Khan, acknowledge that the College has accepted this Undertaking
                  in lieu of making an Order under s.25.4 of the Code and no further action
                  will be taken on the Investigation.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (5)   I, Dr. Khan, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately.

            (6)   Practice Restriction

                  (a)   I, Dr. Khan, undertake that I will limit my practice to
                        psychotherapy. 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Khan, undertake that I will limit the number of patients I
                        treat each day to 18 patients.
                  
            (7)   Prescribing Restriction

                  (a)   I, Dr. Khan undertake that I will not prescribe or renew
                        prescriptions for any medication for any purpose.
                  
            (8)   Referring Current Patients

                  (a)   I, Dr. Khan undertake that I will prepare a list of all of my
                        current patients to whom I prescribe and/or to whom I provide
                        services other than psychotherapy.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Khan undertake to assist the above described patients with a
                        referral to a physician to assist them with their ongoing
                        prescribing and psychiatric needs.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Khan acknowledge that notwithstanding my practice and
                        prescribing limitations set out in (6) and (7) above, for three
                        months after the date of this undertaking I can prescribe and
                        provide services to the patients described in 8(a) only.
                  
            (9)   Sign 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Khan, undertake that I shall post a sign in all waiting
                        rooms of all my Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure
                        location, in the form set out at Appendix "A."  For further
                        clarity, this sign shall state as follows: "Dr. Ghulam Zain-Ul-Din
                        Khan has agreed to not prescribe or renew prescriptions for any
                        medication for any purpose. Dr. Khan has limited his practice to
                        psychotherapy. Further information may be found on the College of
                        Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca".
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Dr. Khan, undertake to post a certified translation in any
                        language in which I provide services, of the sign described in
                        section (8)(a) in all waiting rooms of all my Practice Locations,
                        in a clearly visible and secure location, in the form set out at
                        Appendix "A." 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Dr. Khan, undertake to provide the certified translation
                        described in section (8)(b), to the College within thirty (30) days
                        of executing this Undertaking.
                  (d)   I, Dr. Dr. Khan, undertake that if I elect, after the execution of
                        this Undertaking, to provide services in any other language, I will
                        notify the College prior to providing any such services. 
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Dr. Khan, undertake to provide to the College the certified
                        translation described in section (8)(b) prior to beginning to
                        provide services in any language described in section (8)(d).
                  
            (10)  Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Khan, undertake to practise under the guidance of a clinical
                        supervisor or clinical supervisors acceptable to the College (the
                        "Clinical Supervisor" or "Clinical Supervisors"), for at least ten
                        (10) months ("Clinical Supervision"). 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Khan, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor's undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "B", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor. The
                        Clinical Supervisor will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the
                              Individualized Education Plan ("IEP"), attached hereto as
                              Appendix "C";
                  
                        (ii)  Review the materials provided by the College and have an
                              initial meeting to discuss the objectives for the Clinical
                              Supervision and practice improvement recommendations;
                  
                        (iii) During the first month, the supervision shall be at a high
                              level.  The Clinical Supervisor will review and sign off on
                              every patient encounter and will be the Most Responsible
                              Physician.  The Clinical Supervisor will directly observe a
                              minimum of one patient encounter daily for one week and one
                              patient encounter per week for three weeks thereafter. The
                              Clinical Supervisor will submit a written report to the
                              College on a weekly basis.
                  
                        (iv)  Further to the recommendation of the Clinical Supervisor and
                              subject to the approval of the College, upon receiving
                              permission to transition to moderate level supervision, the
                              Clinical Supervisor will meet with me at my Practice
                              Location, or another location approved by the College, once
                              every two weeks for three (3) months, review at least fifteen
                              (15) of my patient charts at every meeting and will submit a
                              written report to the College on a monthly basis;
                  
                        (v)   Further to the recommendation of the Clinical Supervisor and
                              subject to the approval of the College, upon receiving
                              permission to transition to low level supervision, the
                              Clinical Supervisor will meet with me at my Practice
                              Location, or another location approved by the College, once
                              every month for six (6) months, review at least fifteen (15)
                              of my patient charts at every meeting and will submit a
                              written report to the College once every three months;
                  
                        (vi)  I will be the Most Responsible Physician during moderate and
                              low level supervision.
                  
                        (vii) Throughout the supervision the Clinical Supervisor will
                              discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews; make
                              recommendations to me for practice improvements and ongoing
                              professional development and inquire into my compliance with
                              the recommendations and perform any other duties, such as
                              reviewing other documents or conducting interviews with staff
                              or colleagues, that the Clinical Supervisor deems necessary
                              to my Clinical Supervision
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Khan, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be selected
                        by the Clinical Supervisor based on the educational needs
                        identified in the IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "C", as well as
                        the areas of concern identified in the report of the assessor
                        dated November 27, 2019, and concerns that may arise during the
                        period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Khan, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "B" to this Undertaking, and to abide by
                        the recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor, including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Khan, undertake to ensure that Appendix "B" to this
                        Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Khan, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "B" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Khan, undertake that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (6)(e) and/or
                        (f) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time as I
                        have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Khan, acknowledge that if I am required to cease practise as
                        a result of section (6)(g) above this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that
                        term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (11)  Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Khan, undertake to participate in and successfully complete
                        all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "C",
                        including all of the following professional education (the
                        "Professional Education"):
                  
                        (i)   a program or programs satisfactory to the College in: 
                  
                              1.    MDPAC Psychotherapy Training Program, MDPAC; 
                  
                              2.    Medical Record-Keeping Course, University of Toronto;
                  
                              3.    Documentation: Charting Medical Records eLearning
                                    Module, CMPA; and 
                  
                              4.    Documentation II: Principles of Medical Record Keeping
                                    eLearning Module, CMPA.
                  
                        (ii)  Review, reflection and written summary of:
                  
                              1.    Consent to Treatment, CPSO Policy; 
                  
                              2.    Third Party Reports, CPSO Policy;
                  
                              3.    Boundary Violations, CPSO Policy;
                  
                              4.    The Practice Guide, CPSO Policy;
                  
                              5.    Medical Records Documentation, CPSO Policy; 
                  
                              6.    Medical Records Management, CPSO Policy;
                  
                              7.    Transitions in Care, CPSO Policy;
                  
                              8.    Guide to enhancing referrals and consultations between
                                    physicians, CFPC and Royal College; and
                  
                              9.    Managing Tests, CPSO Policy.
                  
                              and

                        (iii) any additional professional education recommended by my
                              Clinical Supervisor.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Khan, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the Professional Education, including
                        proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment
                        reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that
                        the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have
                        successfully completed the Professional Education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Khan, undertake to complete this requirement within ten
                        months or, if no satisfactory program is available by that time, by
                        the first possible opportunity thereafter.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Khan, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided
                        to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the
                        Professional Education.
                  
            (12)  Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Khan, undertake that, approximately three (3) months after
                        the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section (6)
                        above and Appendix "B" to this Undertaking, and the completion of
                        the Professional Education set out in section (11) above, I will
                        submit to a reassessment of my practice ("the Reassessment") by an
                        assessor or assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor" or
                        "Assessors").  I acknowledge that the Reassessment may include a
                        chart review of a minimum of fifteen (15) charts, direct
                        observation of my care, interviews with me, colleagues and
                        co-workers, feedback from patients, and any other tools deemed
                        necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Khan, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment,
                        conducted under the term of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Khan, acknowledge that my Clinical Supervisor may receive
                        and review the findings of the Assessor, and may discuss with the
                        Assessor any issues or concerns arising from the Reassessment. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Khan, acknowledge that the results of the Reassessment will
                        be provided to me and reported to the College and the Reassessment
                        may form the basis of further action by the College. 
                  
            (13)  Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Khan, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location at which I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent
                        Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction
                        (collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"),
                        within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward,
                        I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new
                        Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at
                        that location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Khan, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
                        with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient
                        records by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring
                        my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Khan, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP, NMS and/or any person who or
                        institution that may have relevant information, in order for the
                        College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this
                        Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Khan, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS
                        consent forms, attached hereto as Appendix "D" and Appendix "E",
                        respectively. 
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (14)  I, Dr. Khan, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (15)  I, Dr. Khan, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible
                  for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (16)  I, Dr. Khan, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (17)  I, Dr. Khan, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at
                  any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").

            (18)  I, Dr. Khan, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (19)  I, Dr. Khan, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (20)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Khan, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Khan, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (20)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              Following an investigation that raised concerns about Dr.
                              Khan's standard of practice, Dr. Khan underwent remediation
                              and submitted to a reassessment. The reassessment report
                              subsequently received by the College raised concerns about
                              Dr. Khan's standard of practice. As a result:
                  
                              Dr. Khan has limited his practice to psychotherapy.
                  
                              Dr. Khan will not prescribe any medication for any purpose.
                  
                              Dr. Khan will practise under the guidance of a Clinical
                              Supervisor acceptable to the College for ten (10) months. 
                  
                              Dr. Khan will engage in professional education including in
                              psychotherapy, medical record keeping and communications.
                  
                              Dr. Khan's practice will be reassessed by an assessor
                              selected by the College within three (3) months of the end of
                              the period of Clinical Supervision and Professional
                              Education.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (21)  I, Dr. Khan, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education and
                  to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (22)  I, Dr. Khan, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (23)  I, Dr. Khan, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate my
                  completion of the Professional Education, and to all Clinical
                  Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the College,
                  and to one another, any of the following:

                  (a)   any information relevant to this Undertaking;
                  (b)   any information relevant to the provisions of the Clinical
                        Supervisor's undertaking set out at Appendix "B" to this
                        Undertaking;
                  
                  (c)   any information relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my
                        compliance with this Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (e)   any information which comes to their attention in the course of
                        providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably
                        believe indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: April 13, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Ghulam Zain-Ul-Din Khan to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 13, 2020:

Following an investigation that raised concerns about Dr. Khan’s standard of practice, Dr. Khan underwent remediation and submitted to a reassessment. The reassessment report subsequently received by the College raised concerns about Dr. Khan’s standard of practice. As a result:

Dr. Khan has limited his practice to psychotherapy.

Dr. Khan will not prescribe any medication for any purpose.

Dr. Khan will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for ten (10) months.

Dr. Khan will engage in professional education including in psychotherapy, medical record keeping and communications.

Dr. Khan’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within three (3) months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision and Professional Education.