skip to content

Harrigan, Gordon Richmond

CPSO#: 27781

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. G. R. Harrigan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 13 2019

Medical Records Location

Address: Joseph Brant Hospital 1245 Lakeshore Rd Burlington ON L75 0A2
Date Received: 01 May 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 14 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019