skip to content

Guaiana, Giuseppe

CPSO#: 91426

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 Jul 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jul 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Milan, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Thomas Elgin General Hospital
189 Elm Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 5C4
Phone: (519) 631-2020 Ext. 2792
Fax: (519) 631-6497 Electoral District: 02

Additional Practice Location(s)

Saint Thomas Elgin General Hospital
189 Elm Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 5C4
Canada
County: County of Elgin
Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Giuseppe Guaiana Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 01 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Guaiana ( CPSO# 91426 )

Business Address:
Parkwood Insititue
Mental Health Care Building
F4-430 - 550 Wellington Road South
London ON  N6C 0A7
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
St Thomas Elgin General Hospital
189 Elm Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 5C4
Phone Number: (519) 631-2020


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Italy

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital London
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:16 May 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GIUSEPPE GUAIANA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUAIANA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Mar 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 07 Mar 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Jul 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2021