skip to content

Faclier, Gil

CPSO#: 29502

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 02 Aug 1977
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 Aug 1977

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cape Town, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4864
Fax: (416) 480-6039 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

womens college hospital
76 grenville st
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Canada
Phone: (416) 323-6269
Fax: (416) 323-2666
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Gil Faclier Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 17 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Faclier ( CPSO# 29502 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook & Women's College Hospital
2075 Bayview Avenue
Suite M3-200
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4864


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



New Brunswick

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 13 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GIL FACLIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FACLIER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Apr 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 1977