skip to content

Fuss, Carolyn Lee

CPSO#: 86770

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 26 Jun 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 404
435 The Boardwalk
Waterloo ON  N2T 0C2
Phone: 226-476-3178
Fax: 226-336-8105 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

10B Victoria St South
Kitchener ON  N2G 1C5
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Carolyn Fuss Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 13 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Fuss ( CPSO# 86770 )

Business Address:
CFFM Boardwalk
404-435
The Boardwalk
Waterloo ON  N2T 0C2
Phone Number: 226-476-3178

Business Address:
The Centre for Family Medicine
10 B Victoria Street South
Kitchener ON  N2G 1C5
Phone Number: (519) 783-0021

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CAROLYN LEE FUSS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FUSS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2009