skip to content

Furtado, Norman

CPSO#: 86522

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:Western University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Strathroy FHO - Ailsa Craig Site
147 Ailsa Craig Main Street
Box 340
Ailsa Craig ON  N0M 1A0
Phone: (519) 293-3981
Fax: (519) 518-2258 Electoral District: 02

Additional Practice Location(s)

Strathroy Middlesex Gen Hospital
395 Carrie Street
Strathroy ON  N7G 3J4
Canada
Phone: (519) 245-1550
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. N. Furtado Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 14 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Furtado ( CPSO# 86522 )

Business Address:
North Middlesex
Community Medical Centre
147 Ailsa Craig Main Street
Box 340
Ailsa Craig ON  N0M 1A0
Phone Number: (519) 293-3981

Business Address:
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
395 Carrie Street
Strathroy ON  N7G 3J4
Phone Number: (519) 245-1550

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:19 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NORMAN FURTADO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FURTADO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2009