Furtado, Louis Alexandre Da Silva (CPSO#: 98438)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Oct 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Oct 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:Queen's University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
490 College Street
Toronto ON  M6G 1A4
Phone: 416 5518181
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. Furtado Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 18 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Furtado ( CPSO# 98438 )

Business Address:
490 College Street
Toronto ON  M6G 1A4
Phone Number: (613) 700-8989

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LOUIS ALEXANDRE DA SILVA FURTADO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FURTADO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 20 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Oct 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2014