skip to content

Furlonge, Dexter Andeev

CPSO#: 90611

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 02 Sep 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 Sep 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of The West Indies,Trinidad, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 228
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Phone: (416) 783-3375
Fax: (416) 783-3376 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Hospital For Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Canada
Phone: 416 813 6838
Fax: 416 813 7040
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Uptown Eye Specialists
Suite 401
7900 Hurontario Street
Brampton ON  L6Y 0P6
Canada
Phone: 416 292 0330
Fax: 416 292 0331
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: D. A. Furlonge Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 28 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Furlonge ( CPSO# 90611 )

Business Address:
228 - 1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Phone Number: (416) 783-3375

Business Address:
401 - 7900 Hurontario Street
Brampton ON  L6Y 0P6
Phone Number: (416) 292-0330

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DEXTER ANDEEV FURLONGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FURLONGE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
AVP - Ophthalmology

University Of Toronto, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2016