skip to content

Furlong, Michael James

CPSO#: 100706

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Orleans Urgent Care Clinic
1220 Place d'Orleans Drive
Orleans ON  K1C 7K3
Phone: (709) 690-6909 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

75 Spring Street
Almonte ON  K0A 1A0
Canada
Phone: 613-256-2500
County: County of Lanark
Electoral District: 07

60 CORNELIA STREET WEST
Smiths Falls ON  K7A 2H9
Canada
Phone: 613-283-2330
County: County of Lanark
Electoral District: 07

309-1580 Merivale Road
Ottawa ON  K2G 4B5
Canada
Phone: 613-226-4030
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

507-1081 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2G 4B5
Canada
Phone: 613-729-1165
Fax: 613-380-8189
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

802-1081 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4G2
Canada
Phone: (613) 725-2335
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

801-1081 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4G2
Canada
Phone: (613) 725-2334
Fax: (613) 725-3017
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Lady Dunn Health Centre
17 Government Road
Wawa ON  P0S 1K0
Canada
Phone: 705-856-2335
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08

Pembroke Regional Hospital
705 MacKay Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G8
Canada
Phone: 613-732-2811
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Lady Dunn Health Centre Wawa
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MICHAEL JAMES FURLONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FURLONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015