skip to content

Furlan, Julio Cesar

CPSO#: 90628

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 16 Sep 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 12 May 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:University of Sao Paulo, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Lyndhurst Centre
520 Sutherland Drive
Room 206J
Toronto ON  M4G 3V9
Phone: (416) 597-3422 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

399 Bathurst Street
Altum WSIB Neurology Program
Toronto ON  M5T2S8
Canada
Phone: 4166035800
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Lyndhurst Centre Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective:14 May 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JULIO CESAR FURLAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FURLAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
AVP - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 15 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
CF - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University Of Toronto, 01 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 May 2016