skip to content

Funk, Christopher Barry Roy

CPSO#: 96449

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Max Rady College of Medicine, University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queensway Carleton Hospital
Emergency Department
3045 Baseline Rd
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone: 613-721-2000 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Christopher Funk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 01 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Funk ( CPSO# 96449 )

Business Address:
Queensway Carleton Hospital
Emergency Department
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-2000

Business Address:
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone Number: (613) 761-4203

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:29 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:15 Oct 2018 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER BARRY ROY FUNK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FUNK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011