Fung, Siu-Yue Frances (CPSO#: 96400)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Room H115
c/o Dr Luis Teodoro Da Luz
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins ON  P4N 8P2
Canada
County: Territorial District of Cochrane
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Frances Fung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 10 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Fung ( CPSO# 96400 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room H115
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Business Address:
700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins ON  P4N 8P2
Phone Number: (705) 267-2131

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Manitoba
Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SIU-YUE FRANCES FUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011