skip to content

Fung, Sharon

CPSO#: 86847

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 10 Aug 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 26 Nov 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St. George's University School of Medici, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 12 Main Street North Markham ON L3P 1X2
Date Received: 10 Aug 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
AVP - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 03 Nov 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 04 Nov 2011 to 03 Nov 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 04 Nov 2012 to 31 Mar 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Nov 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Aug 2016