skip to content

Fung, Irene Ngar Yee

CPSO#: 86810

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Apr 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 11 Apr 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
605 Royal York Road
Etobicoke ON  M8Y 4G5
Phone: (416) 800-6500
Fax: (416) 342-1790 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

4A-128 Queen St South
Mississauga ON  L5M 1K8
Canada
Phone: 905-997-7711
Fax: 905-997-7714
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Irene Ngar Yee Fung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 12 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Fung ( CPSO# 86810 )

Business Address:
101-605 Royal York Road
Etobicoke ON  M8Y 4G5
Phone Number: (416) 800-6500

Business Address:
4A - 128 Queen Street South
Mississauga ON  L5M 1K8
Phone Number: (905) 997-7711

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology and Allergy Effective:20 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. IRENE NGAR YEE FUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 2013