skip to content

Fuller, Elisa Christina

CPSO#: 98187

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Lambton CHC
3-59 King Street West
Forest ON  N0N1J0
Phone: (519)786-4545
Fax: (519)786-6318 Electoral District: 01

Additional Practice Location(s)

Kettle Point CHC
6275 Indian Lane
Forest ON  N0N1J1
Canada
Phone: (519)786-2700
Fax: (519)786-4992
County: County of Lambton
Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Fuller Goela Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 26 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Goela ( CPSO# 98140 )
Dr. E. Fuller ( CPSO# 98187 )

Business Address:
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6100

Business Address:
Bluewater Health
Emergency Department
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone Number: (519) 464-4400

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ELISA CHRISTINA FULLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FULLER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2014