skip to content

Fulford, Robert Alan

CPSO#: 19339

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 24 Aug 1984
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Queen's University, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1966 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Mar 1962
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Jul 1962
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 1964
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Feb 1967
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Aug 1984