skip to content

Frye, Helen Lenore

CPSO#: 29250

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 May 1986
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 06 Feb 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Alexandra Medical Centre
29 Noxon Street
Ingersoll ON  N5C 3B1
Phone: (519) 485-9617
Fax: (519)686-8222 Electoral District: 02

Additional Practice Location(s)

29 Noxon St
Alexandra Medical Centre
Ingersoll ON  N5C 1B8
Canada
Phone: 519-485-9617
County: County of Oxford
Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Helen Frye Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 14 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Frye ( CPSO# 29250 )

Business Address:
17 Government Road
Wawa ON  P0S 1K0

Business Address:
Alexandra Medical Centre/Hospital
29 Noxon Street
Ingersoll ON  N5C 3V6
Phone Number: (519) 485-9617

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1987 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Sep 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 May 1986
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Feb 2020
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 06 Feb 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 06 Feb 2020 Active
 
            As from February 6, 2020, the following is imposed as terms, conditions and
            limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Helen Lenore Frye in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Frye to the College of
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:
                        
                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR. HELEN LENORE FRYE
                                          ("Dr. Frye")
                  
                                                to
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended;
                  
                  "Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College;
                  
                   "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Frye, certificate of registration number 29250, am a member of the
                  College.

            (3)   I, Dr. Frye, acknowledge that the College conducted an investigation
                  bearing File Number 1104902 (the "Investigation") into whether I engaged
                  in professional misconduct and/or am incompetent in my emergency medicine
                  practice.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Frye, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective effective upon the date this Undertaking is approved by the ICR
                  Committee (the "Effective Date").

            (5)   Practice Restrictions

                  (a)   I, Dr. Frye, undertake that I have restricted my practice to
                        community-based family medicine. For greater clarity, I, Dr Frye,
                        will not be the most responsible physician in any hospital-based
                        setting. 
                  
            (6)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Frye, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location at which I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent
                        Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction
                        (collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"),
                        within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward,
                        I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new
                        Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at
                        that location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Frye, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
                        with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient
                        charts by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring
                        my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Frye, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP, and/or any person who or institution
                        that may have relevant information, in order for the College to
                        monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Frye, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent
                        form, attached hereto as Appendix "A".
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (7)   I, Dr. Frye, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (8)   I, Dr. Frye, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible
                  for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (9)   I, Dr. Frye, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (10)  I, Dr. Frye, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at
                  any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").

            (11)  I, Dr. Frye, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee.

            (12)  I, Dr. Frye, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 



            (13)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Frye, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Frye, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (12)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Frye
                              engaged in professional misconduct and/or was incompetent in
                              the practice of emergency medicine. As a result of the
                              investigation, Dr. Frye has limited her practice to
                              community-based family medicine. Dr. Frye will not be the
                              most-responsible physician in any hospital-based setting.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (14)  I, Dr. Frye, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: February 6, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Helen Lenore Frye to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective February 6, 2020:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Frye engaged in professional misconduct and/or was incompetent in the practice of emergency medicine. As a result of the investigation, Dr. Frye has limited her practice to community-based family medicine. Dr. Frye will not be the most-responsible physician in any hospital-based setting.

 

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: March 16, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)