skip to content

Frotten, Erin Marie

CPSO#: 90786

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rosedale Medical Group
280 Queenston Road
Hamilton ON  L8K1H1
Phone: (905) 547-0508
Fax: 905-547-6865 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Erin Frotten Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 15 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Frotten ( CPSO# 90786 )

Business Address:
Suite 602
2250 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 0W3
Phone Number: (905) 789-7474

Business Address:
301 - 1678 Bloor Street West
Toronto ON  M6P 1A9
Phone Number: (416) 975-9300

Business Address:
280 Queenston Road
Hamilton ON  L8K 1H1
Phone Number: (905) 547-0508

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Freeport Site Kitchener
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ERIN MARIE FROTTEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FROTTEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2011